Samoila, John Paul (CPSO#: 82340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 735-1490
Fax: (519) 735-6236
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Samoila Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Samoila ( CPSO# 82340 )

Business Address:
Suite 206 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 735-1490


Corporation Name: Amster Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Samoila ( CPSO# 82340 )
Dr. S. Amster ( CPSO# 91799 )

Business Address:
206 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 735-1490

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN PAUL SAMOILA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMOILA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Apr 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2006