Samosh, Adam Isaac (CPSO#: 96262)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Martin Samosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 11 2014


Corporation Name: Adam Samosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Westmount Family Physicians Westmount Shopping Centre Suite 254 185 Wonderland Road South London ON N6K 1M6
Date Received: 18 May 2018

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018