Sampaio, Marcos Loreto (CPSO#: 92075)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Sep 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
L2121, CPCR building
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: (613) 737-8830
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Loreto Sampaio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sampaio ( CPSO# 94448 )
Dr. M. Sampaio ( CPSO# 92075 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Module X - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8571

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 04 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Marcos Loreto Sampaio may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.