Sampaio, Tatiana Zorub Assis Loreto (CPSO#: 94448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2014

Expiry Date:  31 Oct 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Nov 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Eastern Ont
Department of Critical Care Med
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3670
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Loreto Sampaio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Sampaio ( CPSO# 94448 )
Dr. M. Sampaio ( CPSO# 92075 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
Module X - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Nov 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2010 to 03 Jan 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2014
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Oct 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Tatiana Zorub Assis Loreto Sampaio may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Paediatrics, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Sampaio holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Sampaio  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Sampaio's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Sampaio's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on November 1, 2014.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on October 31, 2021.