Sample, Clifford Brian (CPSO#: 76714)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 02 Jul 2001 to 10 Aug 2001
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2004