Samrai, Gurinder Singh (CPSO#: 89291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jeanne d'Arc Medical Centre
1887 St. Joseph Blvd.
Orleans ON  K1C 7J2
Phone: (613) 9037563
Fax: (613)9037564
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

550 Terminal Avenue, Unit B22
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Canada
Phone: (613) 731-4770
Fax: (613) 731-4979
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Samrai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Samrai ( CPSO# 89291 )

Business Address:
Jeanne D'Arc Medical Centre
1887 Street Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 7J2
Phone Number: (613) 903-7563

Business Address:
550 Terminal Avenue
Suite B22
Ottawa ON  K1G 0Z3
Phone Number: (613) 731-4770

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURINDER SINGH SAMRAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMRAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2010