Samuel, Justin Varghese (CPSO#: 87931)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Oct 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2 - 1015 Golf Links Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1L6
Phone: 289-239-8216
Fax: 289-239-7746
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Justin Samuel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Samuel ( CPSO# 87931 )

Business Address:
1015 Golf Links Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1L6
Phone Number: (289) 239-8216

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Feb 2015 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Apr 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Justin  Varghese  Samuel  may  practise  medicine  independently in family
            medicine, only.