Sanatani, Michael Susmoy (CPSO#: 74703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Oncology
L H S C - London Regional
Cancer Program
790 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58640
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanatani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Sanatani ( CPSO# 74906 )
Dr. M. Sanatani ( CPSO# 74703 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Oncology
L H S C - London Regional Cancer Program
Suite A3-915
790 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8640

Business Address:
Suite 205
190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone Number: (519) 204-6727

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SUSMOY SANATANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANATANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2004