Sanders, Kevin Mark (CPSO#: 73735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 220
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-0586
Fax: (416) 494-0915
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

208 - 390 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 709-9696
Fax: (905) 709-9764
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 14 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN MARK SANDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2003