Sandhu, Amindeep Singh (CPSO#: 93459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room: E6-325
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 58315
Fax: 519-667-6820
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Scoping Centre
310 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 4P1
Canada
Phone: 5194334700
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Advance Endoscopy & Specialist Ctr.
2227 South Millway, Suite 303
Mississauga ON  L5L 3R6
Canada
Phone: 905-569-7007
Fax: 905-569-7056
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amindeep Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sandhu ( CPSO# 93459 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room E6-325
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6582

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMINDEEP SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014