Sandhu, Charanjit Singh (CPSO#: 81125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2250 Bovaird Drive East, Unit 303
Brampton, Ontario
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905)-792-6223
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charanjit Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sandhu ( CPSO# 81125 )

Business Address:
303-2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone Number: (905) 792-6223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARANJIT SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010