Sandhu, Kirandeep Kaur (CPSO#: 94553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: Dhillon, Kirandeep Kaur (used until: 02 Sep 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Windsor University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara North Family Health Team
Unit 7
145 Carlton Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 1R5
Phone: (905) 988-9617
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kirandeep Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sandhu ( CPSO# 94553 )

Business Address:
Garden City Family Health Team
Unit 7
145 Carlton Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 1R5
Phone Number: (905) 988-8617

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRANDEEP KAUR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 21 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 22 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013