Sandhu, Navneet Kaur (CPSO#: 87962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: Chahal, Navneet Kaur (used until: 10 Apr 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:J. J. M. Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 203
520 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2T 2Z6
Phone: (519) 743-3641
Fax: (519) 743-1042
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Navneet K. Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sandhu ( CPSO# 87962 )

Business Address:
203 - 520 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2T 2Z6
Phone Number: (519) 743-3641

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVNEET KAUR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2111
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2008