Sandhu, Parampal Singh (CPSO#: 83886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4
110 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 5E9
Phone: (905) 454-8866
Fax: (905) 454-6652
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parampal S. Sandhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sandhu ( CPSO# 83886 )

Business Address:
4 - 110 Pertosa Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 5E9
Phone Number: (905) 454-8866

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARAMPAL SINGH SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 02 Jan 2006 to 26 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 May 2006 to 26 Jun 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 27 Jun 2006 to 28 Feb 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 07 Apr 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2011