Sandhu, Takpal Kaur (CPSO#: 93163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: Birdi, Takpal Kaur (used until: 20 May 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Nairobi, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave,
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (613) 986-6384
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 27 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAKPAL KAUR SANDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2017