Sanghera, Gurinder Paul (CPSO#: 77877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1-001
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8385
Fax: (416) 586-5915
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9135 Keele St
Unit A5
Vaughan ON  L4K 0J4
Canada
Phone: (416) 663-3937
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Sanghera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sanghera ( CPSO# 77877 )

Business Address:
Suite 1001
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Unit A5
9135 Keele Street
Vaughan ON  L4K 0J4
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GURINDER PAUL SANGHERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANGHERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007