Sannoufi, Hassan (CPSO#: 81658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Russian

Education:Kalinin State Medical Institute, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
La Vie Health Centre
Suite 150
525 Legget Drive
Kanata ON  K2K 2W2
Phone: (613) 592-0862
Fax: (613) 592-4193
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sannoufi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 16 2007


Corporation Name: Sannoufi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sannoufi ( CPSO# 81658 )

Business Address:
La Vie Health Centre
Suite 150
525 Legget Drive
Kanata ON  K2K 2W2
Phone Number: (613) 592-0862

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000


Corporation Name: Hassan Sannoufi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HASSAN SANNOUFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SANNOUFI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2005