Santana Gonzalez, Jose Orlando (CPSO#: 91981)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Colombia, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 05 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 31 Oct 2009 to 09 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2010 to 09 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2011 to 09 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 10 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015