Santiago, Marcia Helena Alves Maciel (CPSO#: 92242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 14 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidade Federal Do Ceara, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jul 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCIA HELENA ALVES MACIEL SANTIAGO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. SANTIAGO is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. SANTIAGO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. SANTIAGO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. SANTIAGO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. SANTIAGO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. SANTIAGO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2009 to 23 Jan 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 08 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Elective Trainee - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 09 Jul 2018
Elective Trainee - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

McMaster University, 14 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2018