Santos, Gilda Da Cunha (CPSO#: 85805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Dec 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Fundacao Universidade Federal de Sergipe, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416 480 4017
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scaranelo & Santos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011


Corporation Name: Dr. Gilda C. Santos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Santos ( CPSO# 85805 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Laboratory Medicine Program
11th Floor, Room 11E - 217
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4047

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 22 Dec 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2006
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Gilda Da Cunha Santos may practise medicine independently in anatomical
            pathology.