Santos, Marlene Samar (CPSO#: 72016)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Dec 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 11 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 06 May 2005
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 May 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006