Sapir-Pichhadze, Ruth (CPSO#: 82879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Georgian, Hebrew

Education:Hadassah Medical School, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital - Glen Site
1001 Boulevard Décarie
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 35403
Fax: (514) 938-7050

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH SAPIR-PICHHADZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAPIR-PICHHADZE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009