Saposnik, Gustavo (CPSO#: 79371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Jan 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Suite 931
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5155
Fax: (416) 864-5150
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Saposnik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Saposnik ( CPSO# 79371 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 931
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5155

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Argentina
Spain

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 14 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 2003 to 21 Jul 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Gustavo Saposnik may practise medicine independently in neurology.