Sardar, Yasmin (CPSO#: 89880)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 18 Sep 2008 to 10 Dec 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 11 Dec 2008 to 17 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 18 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015