Sarin, Nitin (CPSO#: 79463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: (905) 707-5008
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Main Health Care
294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C4X5
Canada
Phone: 416-693-3030
Fax: 416-693-3033
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Dynamic Medical Clinic
5734 Yonge Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M2M 4E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 222-5501 Ext. 225
Fax: 416-222-1932
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N. Sarin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Sarin ( CPSO# 79463 )

Business Address:
510 - 330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
300 - 5734 Yonge Street
North York ON  M2M 4E7
Phone Number: (416) 222-5501

Business Address:
301 - 294 Main Street
Toronto ON  M4C 4X5
Phone Number: (416) 693-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 07 Oct 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NITIN SARIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2007