Sarjeant, Jennifer Mary (CPSO#: 72562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Office of the Chief Coroner
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (416) 314-4100
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anand Ghanekar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sarjeant ( CPSO# 72562 )
Dr. A. Ghanekar ( CPSO# 72310 )

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7654

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Clinical Services Building
11 PMB 171
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4606

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MARY SARJEANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARJEANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005