Sarmah, Anita (CPSO#: 73806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Fax: (416) 480-6039
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA SARMAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARMAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2005