Sarraf, Morad Kalimi (CPSO#: 21856)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records up to 2011: 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 888 563 3732 Records from 2012-2016: Albionthistle Town Medical Centre Suite A2 900 Albion Road Toronto, ON M9V 1A5 Tel: 416 740 7272
Date Received: 18 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018