Sarvaria, Sunil (CPSO#: 53930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Tennessee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNIL SARVARIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SARVARIA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1986