Sathiaseelan, Seyon (CPSO#: 84544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
Department of Emergency Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Fax: (905) 883-2138
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Chronic Pain Clinic
500 Huronia Road, Suite 100
Barrie ON  L4N8X3
Canada
Phone: 705 7927890
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Seyon Sathiaseelan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sathiaseelan ( CPSO# 84544 )

Business Address:
100-500 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 8X3
Phone Number: (705) 729-7890

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
Department of Emergency Medicine
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2041

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 10 Nov 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEYON SATHIASEELAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATHIASEELAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 04 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2009 to 03 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 May 2010 to 31 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010