Satsangi, Rashmi (CPSO#: 94569)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Agra University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shiv Saxena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Satsangi ( CPSO# 94569 )
Dr. S. Saxena ( CPSO# 83243 )

Business Address:
KW Healthy Living Centre
1360 Weber Street East
Kitchener ON  N2A 1C4

Business Address:
Suite 202
99 North Field Drive
Waterloo ON  N2K 3P9
Phone Number: (519) 279-1497

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
5th Floor
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2011 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Oct 2015 to 01 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 2015