Satya, Suma Shastry (CPSO#: 87422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 Somerset St, Suite 122
Saint John NB  E2K 4X2
Phone: (506) 214 6581
Fax: 506 214 6583

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMA SHASTRY SATYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SATYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History