Sauder, David Jonathan (CPSO#: 82105)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Jan 2005 to 28 Jan 2005
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2008