Saul, Daniel Israel (CPSO#: 86676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Psychiatry
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4581
Fax: (613) 761-4911
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Saul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Saul ( CPSO# 86676 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
A6 Psychiatry
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4581

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ISRAEL SAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012