Saunders, Brooke (CPSO#: 97735)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: Saunders, Brooke Rachel (used until: 10 Jun 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: 905-338-4690 Ext. 4605
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Eglinton Ave E
suite 604
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Saunders Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Saunders ( CPSO# 97735 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
604 - 1 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3A1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BROOKE SAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 14 Dec 2014
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2015