Sauve, John Thomas (CPSO#: 99286)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne St W
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: Stanton Territorial Hospital 550 Byrne Road Yellowknife NT X1A 2N1
Date Received: 10 Aug 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN THOMAS SAUVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2018