Savasi, Ingrid (CPSO#: 81301)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Suite 8238
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 371-8381
Fax: (519) 371-8399
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Savasi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Savasi ( CPSO# 81301 )

Business Address:
Suite 8238
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 371-8381

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. INGRID SAVASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVASI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2010