Savatteri, Michael (CPSO#: 93670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
198 Barton Street East
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 2K2
Phone: (905) 662-4554
Fax: (905) 662-1468
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Savatteri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Savatteri ( CPSO# 93670 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
198 Barton Street East
Stoney Creek ON  L8E 2K2
Phone Number: (905) 662-4554

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SAVATTERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVATTERI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012