Savenkov, Oleg Anatolievich (CPSO#: 76830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Novosibirsk Medical Institute, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Child and Youth Mental Health Prog
St Catharines Site
Niagara Health System
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 46573
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Savenkov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Savenkov ( CPSO# 76830 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 24 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLEG ANATOLIEVICH SAVENKOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVENKOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2010