Savlov, Deena Joy (CPSO#: 84578)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Egier, Deena Joy (used until: 06 Jul 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kindercare Pediatrics
301-491 Eglinton Avenue W
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Savlov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Savlov ( CPSO# 84578 )

Business Address:
301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 848-7665

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEENA JOY SAVLOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVLOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012