Saxena, Akash Deep (CPSO#: 74432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
809 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2J4
Phone: (905) 338-3331
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

824 King St. West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G1
Canada
Phone: 519 579-2002
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Suite 2
420 North Service Road East
Oakville ON  L6H 5R2
Canada
Phone: 905 338-3331
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

764 Baker Crescent
Kingston ON  K7M 6P6
Canada
Phone: 613 389-4400
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Suite 306
2115 Finch Ave W.
North York ON  M3N 2V6
Canada
Phone: 416 749-2600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AKASH DEEP SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 03 Jan 2000 to 30 Jan 2000
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 31 Jan 2000 to 28 Feb 2000
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2004