Saxena, Pradeep (CPSO#: 87563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Kanpur University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8 - 6521 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 7W1
Phone: (905) 876-0002
Fax: (905) 876-0003
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Unit 5
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K7
Canada
Phone: 905 501 0006
Fax: 905 501 0090
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saxena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Singh ( CPSO# 107625)
Dr. P. Saxena ( CPSO# 87563 )

Business Address:
6521 Derry Road
Suite 8
Milton ON  L9T 7W1
Phone Number: (905) 876-0002

Business Address:
Suite 5
20 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K7


Corporation Name: Mala Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Singh ( CPSO# 107625)
Dr. P. Saxena ( CPSO# 87563 )

Business Address:
Suite 5
20 Kingsbridge Garden Circle
Mississauga ON  L5R 3K7

Business Address:
6521 Derry Road
Suite 8
Milton ON  L9T 7W1
Phone Number: (905) 876-0002

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRADEEP SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 24 Nov 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2009