Saxena, Will (CPSO#: 94870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Mar 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wallaceburg Medical Centre
30 McNaughton Avenue
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 1R9
Phone: (519) 627-1497
Fax: (866) 539-6714
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

325 Margaret Ave
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2A6
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

80 GRAND AVE W
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Saxena Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Saxena ( CPSO# 94870 )

Business Address:
325 Margaret Avenue West
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 2A7
Phone Number: (519) 638-8118

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
Chathan-Kent Family Health Team
Wallaceburg Site
30 McNaughton Avenue
Suite 9
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 1R9
Phone Number: (519) 627-0200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Feb 2014 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Sep 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Will  Saxena may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only,
            excluding emergency medicine.