Sayani, Farzana Azim (CPSO#: 78893)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2003 to 04 Apr 2003
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2006 to 10 Feb 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007