Sayar, Mirwais Abdulla (CPSO#: 83880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Pushto, Russian

Education:Stavropol State Medical Academy, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 302
310 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 2L3
Phone: (519) 743-2142
Fax: (519) 579-0002
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mirwais Sayar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sayar ( CPSO# 83880 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
310 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 743-2142

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRWAIS ABDULLA SAYAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAYAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2006 to 13 Mar 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2008