Sayed-Ali, Adham Ahmed (CPSO#: 82355)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 - 14650 W.Warren Ave
Dearborn MI  48126
United States
Phone: 313 581-0200
Fax: 313-582-3300
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sayed-Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2018


Corporation Name: Hasnain, Sekhon and Sayed-Ali Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 17 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 23 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 23, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Adham A. Sayed-Ali
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Sayed-Ali to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                              DR. ADHAM AHMED SAYED-ALI
                                          ("Dr. Sayed-Ali")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                   "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public; 
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, certificate of registration number 82355, am a member
                  of the College. I acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my medical recordkeeping. I am aware of the College's concern
                  about protecting the public. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, acknowledge that I am not currently practising medicine
                  in Ontario.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the
                  QAC ("Effective Date").

            (5)   I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, undertake to provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days'
                  notice to the College of my intent to return to the practice of medicine
                  in Ontario. 

            (6)   I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, undertake that upon my return to the practice of
                  medicine in Ontario, I shall, at minimum, submit to an assessment of my
                  practice within six (6) months). 

            (7)   I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall
                  forward a request to the General Manager of OHIP that my billing number
                  be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise
                  medicine in Ontario. 

            (8)   I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (9)   I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Sayed-Ali's
                              medical recordkeeping. As a result, Dr. Sayed-Ali's practice
                              was ordered to be reassessed. Dr. Sayed-Ali is not currently
                              practicing medicine in Ontario.  Dr. Sayed-Ali will provide
                              45 days' notice to the College of his intent to return to the
                              practice of medicine in Ontario and submit to an assessment
                              of his practice within six months of his return. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (16)  I, Dr. Sayed-Ali, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: May 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Adham Ahmed Sayed-Ali to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 23, 2018:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Sayed-Ali’s medical recordkeeping. As a result, Dr. Sayed-Ali’s practice was ordered to be reassessed. Dr. Sayed-Ali is not currently practicing medicine in Ontario. Dr. Sayed-Ali will provide 45 days’ notice to the College of his intent to return to the practice of medicine in Ontario and submit to an assessment of his practice within six months of his return.