Scaife, Christopher Robert (CPSO#: 55357)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Lake of Woods Hospital 21 Sylvan St Kenora ON P9N 3W7
Date Received: 03 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018