Scalco, Andreia Zavaloni (CPSO#: 83548)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4624
Fax: (416) 480-5144
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREIA ZAVALONI SCALCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCALCO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2005 to 14 Oct 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 14 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 02 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009