Scalco, Monica Zavaloni (CPSO#: 77623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Sao Paulo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9th Floor
Room 461
New East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5974
Fax: (416) 603-5049
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA ZAVALONI SCALCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCALCO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 06 Apr 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2003 to 03 Oct 2003
International Specialist Physician - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008