Scattolon, Sarah Ann (CPSO#: 93428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Univ Medical Centre
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
1200 Main Street West
HHS 2F43
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76248
Fax: 905-577-8377
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Scattolon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Scattolon ( CPSO# 93428 )

Business Address:
HHS McMaster University - Medical Centre
Department of Obstetrics & Gynecology
1200 Main Street West
HHS SF39
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH ANN SCATTOLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCATTOLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015